MD SB600 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; authorizing specified educational institutions meeting specified criteria to apply to the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to be designated as a qualified institution; requiring the Secretary to approve or reject an application for designation as a qualified institution within 90 days after the application is submitted; requiring county and municipal corporations to provide specified property tax credits to specified entities; etc.
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {405666/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {603427/2 Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {799634/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Boundaries
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Flood Control
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Laboratories
Legislative Policy Committee
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Property Tax
Public Debt
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Boundaries
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Flood Control
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Laboratories
Legislative Policy Committee
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Property Tax
Public Debt
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment