MD SB577 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person who possesses a firearm to maintain liability insurance that provides coverage of at least $250,000 for accidental injuries caused by the firearm; requiring a person who sells, rents, or transfers a firearm to verify that the purchaser, lessee, or transferee has specified liability insurance; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring a person who possesses a firearm before the effective date of the Act to comply with the requirements of the Act on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Liability Insurance Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Dealers
Guns
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Safety
Weapons
Dealers
Guns
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Safety
Weapons
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0577?ys=2013rs |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/sb/sb0577f.pdf |