MD SB547 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purposes of the Baltimore Metropolitan Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to make a specified report annually to the General Assembly; repealing provisions of law that establish the Baltimore Metropolitan Council Advisory board; establishing the Baltimore Region Transportation Board; providing for the purpose and composition of the Board; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207977/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Baltimore Metropolitan Council
Carroll County
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Education
Energy Matters
Harford County
Housing
Howard County
Legislation
Reports
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Baltimore Metropolitan Council
Carroll County
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Education
Energy Matters
Harford County
Housing
Howard County
Legislation
Reports
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment