MD SB544 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to award a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified civil actions; authorizing a court to award attorney's fees to a prevailing defendant only under specified circumstances; establishing the method of calculating specified awards of attorney's fees; establishing that the limit on the liability of the State under the Maryland Tort Claims Act does not include a specified award of attorney's fees and expenses; providing that a specified plaintiff is considered a prevailing plaintiff; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |