MD SB496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an organizational license in Calvert County; authorizing the license to be issued to a fraternal organization, volunteer fire department, or volunteer rescue squad for use on specified premises; authorizing the licensee to sell beer, wine, and liquor by the drink for consumption on the licensed premises only; and providing for an annual license fee of $500.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774936/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
Fire Protection
Nonprofit Organizations
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Fees
Fire Protection
Nonprofit Organizations
Rescue Squads
Volunteers