MD SB483 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified nursing homes to assign to an appropriate committee the task of conducting an annual assessment of workplace safety issues and making recommendations; requiring the committee to consult specified employees of the nursing home; requiring a specified health care facility to establish a workplace safety committee; requiring a workplace safety committee to establish a workplace safety program including specified components; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {277676/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Abuse
Assault
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Harassment
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Job Training
Nursing Homes
Occupational Safety
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Safety
State Hospitals
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Assault
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Harassment
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Job Training
Nursing Homes
Occupational Safety
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Safety
State Hospitals
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment