MD SB477 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Talbot County Board of Education to lease a public school facility to an organization that operates a community-based educational and recreational program, subject to a specified determination and specified limitations.
Title
Education - Talbot County Board of Education - Lease of Public School Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leases and Rent
Sports and Recreation
Talbot County
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leases and Rent
Sports and Recreation
Talbot County