MD SB455 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding an unaccompanied homeless youth to the list of individuals who may be eligible for waiver of specified tuition and fees at specified institutions of higher education; requiring a specified administrator to verify that specified youth qualify as independent students under the federal College Cost Reduction and Access Act; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Tuition Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {834631/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth
Higher Education Commission
Indigent Persons
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Youth