MD SB45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified requirements for the responsible member of an entity providing architectural services; authorizing the State Board of Architects to deny a firm permit to an applicant, reprimand a permit holder, suspend or revoke a permit, or impose a penalty under specified circumstances and subject to specified hearing provisions; etc.
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Architects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Discipline
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Surveyors
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Discipline
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Landscape Architects
Licenses
Limited Liability Companies
Notices
Partnerships
Penalties and Sentences
Surveyors