MD SB448 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; altering a specified penalty; providing that a person who violates specified provisions of law is subject to a civil fine not exceeding $50,000 to be assessed by the Board in accordance with specified regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Cease and Desist Orders and Penalties for Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {554232/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Counselors
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes