MD SB441 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the Worcester County Bingo Board; providing that the Worcester County Department of Development Review and Permitting take the place of the Bingo Board and adopt regulations to administer and enforce the bingo laws in the county; requiring the Department to exercise control and supervision over all games of bingo; requiring a specified representative to consult with the Department and to send specified materials to the Department by a specified date; etc.
Title
Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bingo
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Forms
Gaming
Inspections
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Worcester County
Work, Labor and Employment
Bingo
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Forms
Gaming
Inspections
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Worcester County
Work, Labor and Employment