MD SB438 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a municipality to request that the State Board of Elections include specified offices and questions on a specified ballot; requiring a municipality to file a specified request with the State Board on or before a specified date; requiring a municipality to include a certification as part of a request; providing that a municipality is not required to file a specified request under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {435261/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204330/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Attorneys
Ballots
Clerks of Court
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Referendum
Ballots
Clerks of Court
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Referendum