MD SB433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Newborn Screening Program Fund; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to administer the Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Newborn Screening Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647073/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |