MD SB401 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified political subdivisions to require periodic inspections of specified multifamily dwellings with balcony railings to ensure that each balcony railing meets the requirements of the applicable local housing code or the Minimum Livability Code; authorizing specified political subdivisions to conduct the inspections, authorize a third party to conduct the inspections, or require a specified professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-35) (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-35) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senators Young, Benson, and Ferguson |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Stein, Holmes, and Fraser-Hidalgo |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-36) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {480318/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {924737/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Apartments
Architects
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Engineers
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Safety
Safety
Timesharing
Architects
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Engineers
Fees
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Safety
Safety
Timesharing