MD SB379 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Acupuncture Board to impose a penalty if the Board finds that there are grounds to take disciplinary action against a licensee; authorizing the State Acupuncture Board and the State Board of Dietetic Practice to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; authorizing an acupuncturist, licensed by the Board to practice clinical professional counseling, to provide supervision to an individual performing auricular detoxification; etc.
Title
State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-3) (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-3) (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-3) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {596687/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {954636/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Acupuncturists
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Damages
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Discipline
Evidence
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
State's Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Damages
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Discipline
Evidence
Fraud
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
State's Attorneys
Substance Abuse