MD SB354 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to establish a marketing campaign focusing on reaching renters in high poverty areas and promoting the use of the property tax relief program; authorizing Prince George's County to provide $894,850 to provide additional rent relief for specified residents; etc.
Title
Maryland Renters Tax Credit Program - Marketing Campaign
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {733529/2 Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {859334/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Advertising
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Leases and Rent
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Leases and Rent
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Reports
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property