MD SB345 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit; altering the annual interest rate paid by a mobile home park owner on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; etc.
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708278/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Eviction
Hotels and Motels
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Reports
Security Deposits
Eviction
Hotels and Motels
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Reports
Security Deposits