MD SB333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the standard of proof from clear and convincing evidence to a preponderance of the evidence by which a judge in a peace order hearing must make specified findings before the judge may issue a final peace order or mutual peace orders; and changing the standard of proof by which a judge in a protective order hearing must make specified findings before the judge may grant a final protective or mutual protective orders or extend the term of a protective order.
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-17) (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-17) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {528976/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |