MD SB321 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "serious crime" to provide that a register of wills or court may not grant letters of administration to a person convicted of a crime that reflects adversely on an individual's honesty, trustworthiness, or fitness to perform the duties of a personal representative; providing an exception; prohibiting a court, unless good cause is shown, from appointing, as a guardian of the person of a minor or disabled person, a person who has been convicted of a specified crime; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Guardians
Minors
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Registers of Wills
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ex-Offenders
Guardians
Minors
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Registers of Wills