MD SB294 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the Maryland Horse Industry Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2026, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2023; etc.
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824034/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Food
Legislative Services, Department of
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Animals
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Food
Legislative Services, Department of
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset