MD SB275 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Longitudinal Data System as a statewide data system containing individual-level student data from all levels of education and into the workforce; limiting the linkage of specified student and workforce data under the Maryland Longitudinal Data System to a specified period of time; establishing the purpose of the System; establishing the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center as an independent unit of State government; providing for the organizational placement, location, staffing, and funding of the Center; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Maryland Longitudinal Data System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-09 Third Reading Passed (121-19)
2010-04-09 Conference Committee Report Adopted
2010-04-08 Delegates Olszewski, Gilchrist, and Myers
2010-04-08 Conference Committee Appointed
2010-04-08 House Refuses to Recede
2010-04-04 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-22)
2010-04-03 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-03 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-04-10 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-03-26 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2010-03-23 First Reading Ways and Means & Appropriations
2010-04-09 Passed Enrolled
2010-04-10 Third Reading Passed (43-3)
2010-04-10 Conference Committee Report Adopted
2010-04-09 Senators Pinsky, Reilly, and Conway
2010-04-09 Conference Committee Appointed
2010-04-09 Senate Requests House Recede
2010-04-09 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2010-03-24 Third Reading Passed (36-11)
2010-03-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-23 Special Order later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2010-03-23 Favorable with Amendments
2010-03-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-01-22 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback