MD SB272 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exception for an employer that produces specified documents for inspection to the presumption that an employer-employee relationship exists for purposes of the Workplace Fraud Act; authorizing an employer to comply with a specified requirement to provide records by producing copies of the records; altering the number of days within which an employer is required to produce specified records; requiring the Commissioner to take specified action within a specified time regarding an alleged violation; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (122-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments 867670/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Citations
Contractors
Contracts
Fraud
Hearings
Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Notices
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Contractors
Contracts
Fraud
Hearings
Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Notices
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation