MD SB266 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirement for the Comptroller to withhold Maryland income tax refunds from specified individuals with outstanding warrants to include residents of Baltimore City or individuals who have outstanding warrants from Baltimore City; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-7) (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-7) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |