MD SB256 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to authorize the matching fund of a grant for the Easton Head Start Center to consist of funds expended prior to June 1, 2013; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Emergency Bills
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Talbot County
Education
Emergency Bills
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Talbot County