MD SB249 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence to work, in a specified manner, to develop specified strategies to enable organizations that adopt telemedicine to practice safe security techniques to minimize successful cyber attacks; requiring that members of the Commission reasonably reflect the geographic, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; etc.
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Duties and Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707573/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology