MD SB248 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposing an alternative minimum assessment on corporations doing business in the State; providing for the computation of the alternative minimum assessment as a percentage of a corporation's gross receipts or gross profits, based on an election made by the corporation; limiting the assessment to $5,000,000 for any corporation and to $20,000,000 for affiliated groups of corporations; providing for credits against the corporate income tax under specified circumstances; applying the Act to tax years after 2011; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of Corporations - Alternative Minimum Assessment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
2012-02-08 Hearing 2/15 at 1:15 p.m.
2012-02-08 Hearing cancelled
2012-02-01 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-25 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback