MD SB248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the surcharge on civil cases in the circuit courts from $25 to $55; and increasing the surcharge on civil cases in the District Court from $5 to $8 in summary ejectment cases and from $10 to $15 in all other civil cases; requiring the executive director of the Maryland Legal Services Corporation to prepare a budget for the Corporation; requiring a specified informational budget to be submitted to the General Assembly in conjunction with the budget of the Judicial Branch of the State government; etc.
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] |
Sen. Larry Haines [R] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (96-43) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Special Order later today (Delegate Wood) Rejected (37-93) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Delegates Anderson, Kramer, and Schuler | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-01 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-34) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Raskin | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Corporations
Court Costs
Courts
District Courts
Fees
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Corporations
Court Costs
Courts
District Courts
Fees
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset