MD SB141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a prohibition against tax sales in Baltimore City for nonpayment of specified environmental citations to apply the prohibition only if the total amount of unpaid environmental citations is less than $1,000; authorizing tax sales in Baltimore City for nonpayment of specified environmental citations only after exhaustion of administrative and judicial rights of appeal; requiring Baltimore City to submit a specified report on the implementation of the Act to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {595466/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {523821/1 Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {449033/1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appeals
Baltimore City
Citations
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Land Records
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Recordation
Reports
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Baltimore City
Citations
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Land Records
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Recordation
Reports
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property