MD SB123 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding to the Major Information Technology Development Project Fund money from the sale, lease, or exchange of communications facilities and money received from information technology agreements involving resource sharing; and requiring that specified money paid into the Fund be used for a specified purpose and expanding the authorized uses of the Fund to include that purpose.
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Contracts
Electronic Government
Leases and Rent
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Government
Leases and Rent
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology