MD SB119 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before July 1, 2014, and on or before July 1 each year thereafter, an employer or its insurer that is liable for payment of specified Subsequent Injury Fund assessments to notify the Subsequent Injury Fund of the current billing address to which notices of payment shall be sent; requiring the employer or its insurer to notify the Subsequent Injury Fund of any change of billing address within 30 days of the change of address; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Subsequent Injury Fund - Billing Address Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |