MD SB118 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Juvenile Services adopt regulations requiring the provision of year-round educational services in residential programs; repealing a requirement that the State Department of Education develop and implement an educational program specific to the Charles H. Hickey, Jr. School; repealing requirements related to the transmission of specified records under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Disclosure
Education
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
Students
Disclosure
Education
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
Students