MD SB112 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Innovative Partnerships for Technology Program for State community colleges, including the authority of the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt regulations relating to the Program; and repealing a cross-reference to the Program.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Innovative Partnerships for Technology Program - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology