MD SB1098 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to include in specified audits of specified institutions of higher education an evaluation of the institution's compliance with specified provisions of law relating to the sale of textbooks.
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sale of Textbooks - Audits
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234033/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Textbooks
Higher Education
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Textbooks