MD SB107 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a specified background investigation requirement to the application process for a State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency retailer license; authorizing the Director of the Agency to require specified applicants to submit fingerprints for specified records checks; requiring the Central Repository in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide the Agency with specified information; requiring the Agency to submit specified information and fees to the Central Repository; etc.
Title
State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fees
Fingerprinting
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Notices
Privacy
Records
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fees
Fingerprinting
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Notices
Privacy
Records