MD HB994 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study, identify, and report on specified issues, hold specified meetings, and make specified recommendations; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
County Executives
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education, Boards of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Youth
Committees and Commissions
County Executives
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education, Boards of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Youth