MD HB969 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting specified cross-references to the General Provisions Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; correcting specified errors relating to the General Provisions Article; and providing that specified powers of specified local governments shall be deemed to incorporate and include specified power and authority contained in specified provisions of the General Provisions Article.
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age of Majority
Annotated Code of Maryland
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Courts
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Federal Government
Flags
General Assembly
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Oaths
Political Candidates
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Real Property
Records
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Personnel
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Symbols
Time
Age of Majority
Annotated Code of Maryland
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Counties
Courts
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Federal Government
Flags
General Assembly
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Municipal Corporations
Oaths
Political Candidates
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Officials
Real Property
Records
Reports
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Personnel
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Symbols
Time