MD HB939 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering to December 31 the date by which Caroline County and Talbot County are required to file the counties' annual financial reports with the Department of Legislative Services.
Title
Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Report - Filing Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {330919/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |