MD HB929 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the standards and requirements for the required warning period for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems; altering the standards for signage required for local stationary speed monitoring systems; requiring local jurisdictions to designate specified persons to act in a public liaison capacity; requiring the Maryland Police Training Commission to compile and make publicly available an annual report containing specified information on each local speed monitoring system program; etc.
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-20) (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) {893928/1 Rejected (38-88) (Y: 38 N: 88 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {783726/1 Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schuh) {663824/1 Rejected (46-87) (Y: 46 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {833120/1 Rejected (48-86) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-20) (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) {893928/1 Rejected (38-88) (Y: 38 N: 88 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {783726/1 Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schuh) {663824/1 Rejected (46-87) (Y: 46 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {833120/1 Rejected (48-86) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment {808372/1 Withdrawn |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Motion Recede (Senator Frosh) Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Malone, McMillan, and Stein |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808372/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-20) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) {513825/1 Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {893928/1 Rejected (38-88) |
2014-03-11 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {783726/1 Rejected (45-90) |
2014-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {663824/1 Rejected (46-87) |
2014-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {833120/1 Rejected (48-86) |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {180318/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Citations
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Evidence
Fees
Highways
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Police Training Commission
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Recordings
Records
Reports
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Evidence
Fees
Highways
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Police Training Commission
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Recordings
Records
Reports
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video