MD HB907 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified video lottery operation licensees to provide specified notices to specified obligors who win prizes and who owe child support; requiring specified video lottery operation licensees to make specified payments, withhold specified amounts, and transfer specified amounts under specified circumstances; authorizing specified obligors to appeal specified proposed transfers; requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to notify the video lottery operation licensee on the distribution of specified prizes; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senators King, DeGrange, and Madaleno |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Luedtke, Myers, and Walker |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {469830/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until 3/17 (Turner F) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {743022/1 Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {195068/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Family Law
Fees
Gaming
Human Resources, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents
Appeals
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Family Law
Fees
Gaming
Human Resources, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents