MD HB873 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, on a divided highway that has traffic lights located in specified areas, each intersection that has a traffic light may also have a crosswalk through the divided highway; altering the maximum speed limit on specified divided highways in specified areas; requiring the State Highway Administration or a local jurisdiction to give specified notice to specified members of the General Assembly before increasing the speed limit above a specified threshold on specified highways; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks
Sponsors
Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. James Proctor [D] | Del. David Rudolph [D] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | Delegates Stein, O'Donnell, and Frush |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {278673/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {690316/1 Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {770110/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Counties
General Assembly
Hearings
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pedestrians
Public Information
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
General Assembly
Hearings
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pedestrians
Public Information
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road