MD HB861 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an easement approved for a specified purchase after a specified date to authorize the landowner to request approval to use the land subject to the easement for renewable energy generation under specified circumstances; prohibiting the installation of specified wind turbines exceeding specified heights in specified areas of the State; requiring a specified lease executed by a landowner and a specified facility owner to include provisions related to the removal of a specified facility under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-23) (Y: 111 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-32) (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-32) (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-23) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {154037/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-32) |
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {430613/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-11 | House | Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Economic Matters |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Easements
Farmland
Fees
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Power Plants
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation
Agriculture
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Easements
Farmland
Fees
Leases and Rent
Penalties and Sentences
Power Plants
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation