MD HB786 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding light-emitting diode (LED) light bulbs to the list of Energy Star products exempt from the sales and use tax during President's Day weekend each year.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Weekend - Exemption for Light-Emitting Diode (LED) Lights
Sponsors
Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424 |
2014-03-24 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {865460/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |