MD HB754 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a specified person from bringing a specified action against specified owners under specified circumstances; entitling a specified person who receives specified notice to specified evidence under specified circumstances and within a specified period of time; authorizing a specified owner to require a specified test for elevated blood lead for specified persons within a specified period of time; authorizing a specified person to make a qualified offer in a specified manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified Offer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22HouseUnfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-02-21HouseHearing cancelled
2013-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback