MD HB747 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after January 1, 2005 and that achieves a total system efficiency of 65% or more; defining terms; altering terms; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Grants
Power Plants
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Grants
Power Plants
Utilities
Utility Regulation