MD HB742 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; authorizing specified educational institutions that meet specified criteria to apply to the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to be designated as a qualified institution; requiring the Secretary to approve or reject an application for designation as a qualified institution within 90 days after the application is submitted; requiring county and municipal corporations to provide specified property tax credits for entities locating in a zone; etc.
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {735969/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Bonds
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Exemptions
Flood Control
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Laboratories
Leases and Rent
Legislative Policy Committee
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parking
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Bonds
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Comptroller
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Exemptions
Flood Control
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Laboratories
Leases and Rent
Legislative Policy Committee
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parking
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment