MD HB73 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; prohibiting a judge in a jury trial from making a specified ruling before the jury returns a verdict; establishing that the owner of a dog is liable for injury, death, or loss caused by a dog while the dog is running at large; establishing exceptions; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted (44-1) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {442019/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-11-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Animals
Civil Actions and Procedures
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Death
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Judges
Liability
Trespass
Trials
Civil Actions and Procedures
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Death
Emergency Bills
Evidence
Judges
Liability
Trespass
Trials