MD HB701 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the elements of a specified prohibition involving persuading or enticing from a specified place or knowingly secreting or harboring an individual under the age of 16 years for purposes of prostitution or committing a specified sexual crime so as to prohibit the act of persuading or enticing from a specified place and knowingly secreting or harboring the individual for the purpose of committing a specified sexual crime; reclassifying the offense as a felony and increasing the penalty for violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-05 | House | Delegates Simmons, Swain, and Parrott |
2014-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {898471/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {492611/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abduction
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses