MD HB607 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 31, 2014, to consult with specified experts on issues relating to student data privacy, establish parameters for using a specified software service, and develop sample contracts if a local education agency decides to use a software service for specified tasks; requiring specified local education agencies to use a specified sample contract for specified contracts entered into on or after March 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-5) (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {503321/1 Rejected (46-91) (Y: 46 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {973221/1 Rejected (50-79) (Y: 50 N: 79 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/3 (ODonnell) Rejected (52-74) (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {503321/1 Rejected (46-91) (Y: 46 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {973221/1 Rejected (50-79) (Y: 50 N: 79 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/3 (ODonnell) Rejected (52-74) (Y: 52 N: 74 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-5) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {503321/1 Rejected (46-91) |
2014-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1 Withdrawn |
2014-04-02 | House | Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1 |
2014-04-02 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {973221/1 Rejected (50-79) |
2014-04-02 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (52-74) |
2014-04-02 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {485160/3 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Contracts
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology