MD HB6 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $7500 the maximum amount of a claim against the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund for which the Maryland Home Improvement Commission may issue a proposed order; and increasing to a maximum of 60 the number of days, following specified notice by the Commission, after which the Commission may bring a specified action in court against a contractor who fails to reimburse the Fund in full for payment of a specified claim.
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443191/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-11-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Home Improvement
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Home Improvement
Notices
Revenue and Taxes