MD HB598 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a specified law enforcement agency to maintain a list of specified law enforcement officers solely for the purpose of satisfying a specified disclosure requirement relating to impeachment or exculpatory evidence; requiring a specified law enforcement agency to provide a specified notice to a specified law enforcement officer under specified circumstances; providing that a law enforcement officer maintains all rights of appeal under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Disclosures - Punitive Action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234 |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {248374/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {204669/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |